MO HB303 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to police officer retirement systems and surviving spouse retirement benefits
Title
Modifies provisions relating to police officer retirement systems and surviving spouse retirement benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House: HB 303 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 11:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions(S) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |