MO HB303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the offense of filing false documents
Title
Establishes the offense of filing false documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 303 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: HB 303 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: HB 303 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 9, 2017, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2017, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 149 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |