MO HB3014 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATION BILL
Title
APPROPRIATION BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: HB 3014 HBs with SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: HB 3014 HBs with SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 11 NV: 25 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 5) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 44 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 5) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 4) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 4) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 3) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 52 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 3) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 87 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 30 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 29 NV: 18 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: HB 3014 HBs with SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 11 NV: 25 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 5) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 44 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 5) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 4) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 4) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 3) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 52 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 (*HA 3) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 87 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 30 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: HB 3014 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 29 NV: 18 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27 |
2022-02-24 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2022-02-24 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2022-02-24 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS AYES: 133 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Taken Up |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SS Offered |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Amended 1: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 8:30 a.m., SCR 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-02-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 25 |
2022-02-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 and HA 2, adopted AYES: 112 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 30 |
2022-02-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 18 |
2022-02-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-02-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 22 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |