MO HB3 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a statewide STEM career awareness program and creates new provisions of law related to computer science
Title
Establishes a statewide STEM career awareness program and creates new provisions of law related to computer science
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 96 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 33 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 36 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 96 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 33 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 36 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-09-12 - House - House: HB 3 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-30 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-10-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-09-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-09-19 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-09-19 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-09-19 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-09-14 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-09-14 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2018-09-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-09-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2018-09-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:45 a.m., Friday, September 14, 2018, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, September 13, 2018, 10:15 a.m., or Upon Morning Recess, Senate Lounge |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Economic Development(S) |
2018-09-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-09-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-09-12 | House | Taken Up |
2018-09-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-09-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-09-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-09-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-09-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-09-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-09-12 | House | Taken Up |
2018-09-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-09-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-09-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2018-09-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-09-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |