MO HB297 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that public school students must not be subject to penalties or discipline for simulating a weapon while playing if it does not cause bodily harm, disrupt learning, or constitute a serious threat
Title
Specifies that public school students must not be subject to penalties or discipline for simulating a weapon while playing if it does not cause bodily harm, disrupt learning, or constitute a serious threat
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB297&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0297I.PDF |