MO HB296 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "surviving spouse" as it relates to state personnel law
Title
Modifies definition of "surviving spouse" as it relates to state personnel law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House: HB 296 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 14, 12 noon or upon morning recess, whichever is later, SCR 1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs(S) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-26 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |