MO HB290 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions
Title
Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |