MO HB2894 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to certain persons found guilty of criminal offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to certain persons found guilty of criminal offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |