MO HB287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows any registered voter who is eligible to vote in a particular election to do so by absentee ballot without being required to state a reason
Title
Allows any registered voter who is eligible to vote in a particular election to do so by absentee ballot without being required to state a reason
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-22 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB287&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0287I.PDF |