MO HB287 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a five-year statute of limitations for actions against a mental health professional for malpractice, negligence, or error
Title
Establishes a five-year statute of limitations for actions against a mental health professional for malpractice, negligence, or error
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB287&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0287I.htm |