MO HB282 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Urban Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Urban Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain discriminatory practices on the basis of hair texture and protective hairstyles
Title
Prohibits certain discriminatory practices on the basis of hair texture and protective hairstyles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |