MO HB2787 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Uniform Restrictive Employment Agreement Act"
Title
Establishes the "Uniform Restrictive Employment Agreement Act"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |