MO HB2777 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the training standards for coroners
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the training standards for coroners
Sponsors
Rep. John Voss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |