MO HB2730 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:15 am in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:15 am in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax credits for improving access to food
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax credits for improving access to food
Sponsors
Rep. Dane Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |