MO HB2720 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to land reclamation
Title
Modifies provisions related to land reclamation
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Thomas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |