MO HB272 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the "Small Business Regulatory Fairness Board."
Title
Changes the laws regarding the "Small Business Regulatory Fairness Board."
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 272 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |