MO HB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding local government
Title
Changes the laws regarding local government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House: HB 271 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: HB 271 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: HB 271 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: HB 271 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: HB 271 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: HB 271 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: HB 271 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-06-15 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2021-05-12 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2021-05-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-12 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2021-05-11 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (S) - Section 67.1847 |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-05-10 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2021-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-10 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (H) - Section 67.1847 |
2021-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-10 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2021-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-07 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2021-05-07 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (S) - In Sections 394.020 and 386.800 |
2021-05-07 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-06 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (H) - Sections 386.800 and 394.020 |
2021-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-05 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2021-05-05 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-05 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS CRAWFORD, BERNSKOETTER, ROWDEN, SCHUPP, RAZER |
2021-05-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES WIEMANN, CHIPMAN, TAYLOR(139), MCCREERY, BARINGER |
2021-05-04 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2021-05-04 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (S) - In section 394.020 |
2021-05-04 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2021-05-03 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2021-05-03 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS#2 as amended |
2021-05-03 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 9:00 a.m., Joint Committee Room |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | SS #2 Adopted - SA 1 adopted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | SS #2 Offered |
2021-04-27 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA1 to SA 1, SA 1 as amended, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 11, SA 1 to SA 12, SA 12 as amended, SA 13, SA 14, SA 15, SA 16, SA 17, SA 18, SA 19, SA 20, SA 21, SA 22, SA 1 to SA 23, SA 23 as amended, SA 24, SA 25, SA 26, SA 27 and SA 28, pending |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 31, 1 pm, SCR 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |