MO HB2704 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to marijuana
Title
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |