MO HB27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all state and federal offices to use an instant runoff voting method.
Title
Requires all state and federal offices to use an instant runoff voting method.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB27&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0344H.02I.pdf |