MO HB269 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires motorboats to carry two B1 type fire extinguishers, one B2 fire extinguisher, or a fixed fire extinguisher and one B1 type fire extinguisher
Title
Requires motorboats to carry two B1 type fire extinguishers, one B2 fire extinguisher, or a fixed fire extinguisher and one B1 type fire extinguisher
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - HB 269 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 125 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass consent |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 3:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |