MO HB2682 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the sale of intoxicating liquor at the St. Louis International Airport
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the sale of intoxicating liquor at the St. Louis International Airport
Sponsors
Rep. Noel Shull [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-03-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2682&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2682I.PDF |