MO HB265 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding professional registration
Title
Changes the laws regarding professional registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-13 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-12 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-05-10 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-05 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-23 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |