MO HB2632 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Title
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-04-07 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-04-07 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |