MO HB2603 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Caller ID Anti-Spoofing Act" to protect businesses and residents from unwanted solicitations from misleading or misidentified solicitors
Title
Creates the "Caller ID Anti-Spoofing Act" to protect businesses and residents from unwanted solicitations from misleading or misidentified solicitors
Sponsors
Rep. Mitch Boggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |