MO HB260 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes civil penalties for poaching certain animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes civil penalties for poaching certain animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House: HB 260 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House: HB 260 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HB 260 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-11HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-07HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-07HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 138 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-07HouseTaken Up
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-01HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-01SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended
2019-05-01SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1
2019-05-01SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2019-05-01SenateTaken Up
2019-04-18SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-18SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-16SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-15SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-11SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-08SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-01SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 1, 2019, 2:00pm, SCR 2
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
2019-03-04HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-04HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-04HouseTaken Up
2019-02-27HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2019-02-27HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-27HouseTaken Up
2019-02-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-05HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-14HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback