MO HB260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals and re-enacts provisions regarding the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to be consistent with the changes adopted by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws
Title
Repeals and re-enacts provisions regarding the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to be consistent with the changes adopted by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-06-30 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-04-28 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |