MO HB26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding primary elections.
Title
Changes the law regarding primary elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 102 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 47 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 47 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 62 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 78 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 102 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 47 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 47 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 62 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 78 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 26 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 78 NOES: 72 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-03-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |