MO HB259 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures relating to an insurance group's corporate governance
Title
Establishes procedures relating to an insurance group's corporate governance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB259&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0908H.01I.pdf |