MO HB2585 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to blind pensions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to blind pensions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |