MO HB2567 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions related to security measures for public schools
Title
Creates new provisions related to security measures for public schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |