MO HB2470 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each local school district and charter school to have on file a policy for reading success plans for certain students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each local school district and charter school to have on file a policy for reading success plans for certain students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2020-02-20HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2020-02-17HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback