MO HB2416 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding public employee retirement systems in St. Louis
Title
Changes the laws regarding public employee retirement systems in St. Louis
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 and HCA 2 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |