MO HB2414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Correctional Center Nursery Program
Title
Establishes the Correctional Center Nursery Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2022-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |