MO HB2412 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to payments for prescription drugs.
Title
Enacts provisions relating to payments for prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Helms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |