MO HB2407 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Efficiency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Efficiency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers and restructures the duties and powers of the Department of Health and Senior Services to the Department of Social Services, Department of Mental Health and Health, and the Department of MO Healthnet
Title
Transfers and restructures the duties and powers of the Department of Health and Senior Services to the Department of Social Services, Department of Mental Health and Health, and the Department of MO Healthnet
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2407&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2407I.PDF |