MO HB239 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Veteran Workforce Act which requires the Office of Administration to develop rules and regulations ensuring a uniform hiring preference for veterans, disabled veterans, and their spouses
Title
Establishes the Veteran Workforce Act which requires the Office of Administration to develop rules and regulations ensuring a uniform hiring preference for veterans, disabled veterans, and their spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB239&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0239I.htm |