MO HB2387 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "21st-Century Missouri Education Task Force."
Title
Establishes the "21st-Century Missouri Education Task Force."
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness(H) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |