MO HB2385 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local governments from requiring private property owners to accept certain types of income.
Title
Prohibits local governments from requiring private property owners to accept certain types of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 9, 2024, 9:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2024-03-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 10 |
2024-03-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |