MO HB2380 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows owners of personal motor vehicles and owners of commercial motor vehicles licensed in excess of twelve thousand pounds to apply for special personalized license plates.
Title
Allows owners of personal motor vehicles and owners of commercial motor vehicles licensed in excess of twelve thousand pounds to apply for special personalized license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 127 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House: HB 2380 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 127 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-07-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 100 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 10, 2016, 2:15pm, SCR 2 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 1 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 2, 2016, Bingham Conference Room |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2016, 8:15am, SCR 1 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-04 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 18 NOES: 127 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 128 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-30 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-30 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |