MO HB238 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law relating to public labor organizations
Title
Changes the law relating to public labor organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |