MO HB236 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration date of various federal reimbursement allowances from September 30, 2011, to September 30, 2016
Title
Extends the expiration date of various federal reimbursement allowances from September 30, 2011, to September 30, 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |