MO HB232 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends eligibility for the A+ Schools Program to Missouri public high school students who have an expected family contribution to college expenses at a level determined by the Department of Higher Education
Title
Extends eligibility for the A+ Schools Program to Missouri public high school students who have an expected family contribution to college expenses at a level determined by the Department of Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: Higher Education (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB232&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0232I.htm |