MO HB2312 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a municipality to annex a research park under certain circumstances
Title
Allows a municipality to annex a research park under certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-03-15 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2312&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2312I.htm |