MO HB2310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates several new state designations
Title
Creates several new state designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: HB 2310 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 4 to HA 3, HA 5 to HA 3, HA 6 to HA 3, HA 8 to HA 3, HA 9 to HA 3, HA 10 to HA 3, HA 3, as amended. |
2022-04-26 | House | HS Adopted (H) |
2022-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-21 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, HA 1 to HA 3, adopted, and HA 2 to HA 3 and HA 3, as amended, pending. |
2022-04-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-30 | House | HS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-28 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Committed to: Legislative Review(H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2022-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |