MO HB2280 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands MO HealthNet benefits for pregnant women to provide substance abuse treatment for up to one year after giving birth

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands MO HealthNet benefits for pregnant women to provide substance abuse treatment for up to one year after giving birth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 2280 (1616) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 2280 (1616) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: HB 2280 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: HB 2280 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 127 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2018-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17SenateTaken Up
2018-05-17SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-17SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2018-05-17SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 17, 2018, Upon morning recess, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-16SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-16SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-16SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-16SenateTaken Up
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-14SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-10SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-09SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-12SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 17, 2018, 2:00 p.m., SCR 1
2018-04-11SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2018-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
2018-04-05SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
2018-03-26HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-26HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-26HouseTaken Up
2018-03-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-14HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-03-14HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-03-14HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-14HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-14HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-22HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-22HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-21HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2018-01-29HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback