MO HB2276 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]


Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm



2018-03-15HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-03-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-06HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-03-06HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-13HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2018-01-29HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

Bill Comments