MO HB2270 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows child abuse medical resource centers and SAFE CARE providers to collaborate to promote improved services to children who are suspected victims of abuse in need of a forensic medical exam
Title
Allows child abuse medical resource centers and SAFE CARE providers to collaborate to promote improved services to children who are suspected victims of abuse in need of a forensic medical exam
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-14 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-04-27 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-13 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |