MO HB225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SS/sa 1 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SS/sa 1 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Fast-Track Workforce Incentive Grant."
Title
Creates the "Fast-Track Workforce Incentive Grant."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House: HB 225 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS/sa 1 pending |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 11:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 12:15pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2019-03-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HCA 2 adopted AYES: 101 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 2 |
2019-02-28 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 2 AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |