MO HB225 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Governor from making appointments of state legislators to positions in exchange for votes on legislation and requires gubernatorial appointments to make political contribution disclosures
Title
Prohibits the Governor from making appointments of state legislators to positions in exchange for votes on legislation and requires gubernatorial appointments to make political contribution disclosures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB225&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0225I.PDF |