MO HB2244 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner.
Title
Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2244&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5009H.01I.pdf |